Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Trust Act
Sponsored by
Senator Stone
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing and revising provisions of law relating to trusts; providing that the Act may be cited as the Maryland Trust Act; providing for the scope of the Act; establishing whether a person has knowledge of a fact under the Act; establishing that a term of a trust prevails over specified other provisions of law, with specified exceptions; establishing that the common law of trusts and principles of equity supplement the Act, with a specified exception; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0437
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/05/2013 Text - First - Maryland Trust Act
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-102, 14.5-101 through 14.5-1005, 14-101 through 14-115 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM