Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health - Sale of Food Products Containing Alcohol - Requirements and Restrictions
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, Kelley, Mathias, Middleton, Pugh, and Reilly
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 695
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing a provision of law that provided that a confectionary food product is adulterated if it contains any alcohol in excess of a specified percent by volume or any alcohol derived from anything but flavoring extracts; prohibiting specified provisions of law from being construed to prohibit the addition of alcohol to a food product, including a confectionery and a frozen dessert; prohibiting the sale of a food product that contains more than one-half of one percent of alcohol per volume to an individual under 21 years of age; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {117877/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
71
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
71
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Pena-Melnyk) Adopted (140-0)
Proceedings
71
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (141-0)
Proceedings
71
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/28/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 695
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/03/2016 3/04/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Favorable with Amendments {117877/1 Report Adopted 38
Senate 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38
Senate 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 40
House 3/10/2016 3/10/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations 42
House 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 71
House 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Second Reading Passed 71
House 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Pena-Melnyk) Adopted (140-0) 71
House 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Third Reading Passed (141-0) 71
Senate 4/12/2016 4/08/2016 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/28/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 695
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-209, 21-214 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM