Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Elementary and Secondary Education Expenses
Sponsored by
Senators Lam and Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:45 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Excluding from a subtraction modification certain contributions to and distributions from a certain investment plan that is used for certain elementary and secondary education expenses; requiring the Comptroller, under certain circumstances, to impose certain penalties; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2018.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0525
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0644 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - State Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Elementary and Secondary Education Expenses
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:45 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-207, 10-208, 13-718 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM