Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Commerce – COVID–19 Business Relief Distribution – Reporting
Sponsored by
Senator Hayes
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Commerce to submit to the House Appropriations and the Senate Budget and Taxations Committees a report containing demographic information, including race, age, gender, and socioeconomic status, of each recipient of COVID-19 business relief in the State such as small business relief and other financial assistance intended to address the economic impact of COVID-19 within 30 days after enactment of the Act.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Reassigned to Finance
Proceedings
8 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Reassigned to Finance 8 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - First - Department of Commerce – COVID–19 Business Relief Distribution – Reporting
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2021 3/15/2021 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 3/18/2021 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Age
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:21 PM
Click to return on the top page