Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Membership
Sponsored by
Senator Guzzone
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 172
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Transferring specified individuals into the Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System; requiring an individual who is transferred into the Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System to make specified deposits in the annuity savings fund of the Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System; requiring the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System to make specified transfers to the specified accumulation fund and annuity savings fund; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1110
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Membership
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 8:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {659236/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Membership
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 172
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Membership
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Membership
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/02 at 8:30 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable with Amendments {659236/1 Adopted 43
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
Text - Third - Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Membership
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 45
House 3/16/2017 3/13/2017 Referred Appropriations 47
House 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/31/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 62
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 172
Text - Chapter - Law Enforcement Officers' Pension System - Membership
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   26-201, 26-202, 26-203.4 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM