Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance - Central Committee Candidates
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 380
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that a specified provision of law relating to campaign finance entities does not apply to candidates for election to the central committee of a political party if the candidate during an election cycle does not spend more than $1,000 in personal funds or accept contributions; requiring specified candidates for election to the central committee of a political party to keep a specified account book, preserve the account book for specified purposes and for a specified period of time, and file a specified affidavit; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/16/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2015
Legislative Date
2/26/2015
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {565868/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Special Order until 4/9 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 380
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/13/2015 2/16/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/26/2015 2/27/2015 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2015 2/26/2015 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/20/2015 3/23/2015 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 47A
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Second Reading Passed 47A
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48
House 3/25/2015 3/23/2015 First Reading Ways and Means 53
House 3/25/2015 3/25/2015 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/06/2015 3/31/2015 Favorable with Amendments {565868/1 Report Adopted 61
House 4/06/2015 3/31/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Special Order until 4/9 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted 63
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) 64
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Special Order until later today (Senator Conway) Adopted 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Senate Concur - House Amendments 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Passed Enrolled 61
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 380
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-202, 13-221, 13-305.1, 13-604.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM