Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - Foreclosure Relief Act of 2015
Sponsored by
Senator Muse
Status
In the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Rosapepe)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the court to send the mortgagor or grantor a specified checklist when a specified foreclosure action is filed in Prince George's County; prohibiting a lender from maintaining an action to foreclose a mortgage or deed of trust on residential real property in Prince George's County for 6 months; requiring the Office of the Attorney General to study specified matters relating to foreclosure actions and report the findings to the General Assembly on or before July 1, 2016; terminating specified provisions of the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0929
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/16/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {438971/1
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/22/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {438971/1
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/22/2015
Action
Special Order until 3/30 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {438971/1
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Special Order until 4/1 (Senator Muse) Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {438971/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Muse) {283421/1
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Special Order until 4/2 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Muse) {283421/1
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Special Order until 4/3 (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Muse) {283421/1 Rejected (22-24)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Rosapepe)
Proceedings
56
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/13/2015 2/16/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/05/2015 3/06/2015 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/20/2015 3/23/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 Favorable with Amendments {438971/1 48
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted 48
Senate 3/25/2015 3/22/2015 Favorable with Amendments {438971/1 49
Senate 3/25/2015 3/22/2015 Special Order until 3/30 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 49
Senate 3/30/2015 3/25/2015 Favorable with Amendments {438971/1 52
Senate 3/30/2015 3/25/2015 Special Order until 4/1 (Senator Muse) Adopted 52
Senate 4/01/2015 3/27/2015 Favorable with Amendments {438971/1 Report Adopted 54
Senate 4/01/2015 3/27/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Muse) {283421/1 54
Senate 4/01/2015 3/27/2015 Special Order until 4/2 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 54
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Muse) {283421/1 55
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Special Order until 4/3 (Senator Middleton) Adopted 55
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Muse) {283421/1 Rejected (22-24) 56
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Rosapepe) 56
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-105.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM