Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverage Taxes - Electronic Filing of Returns
Sponsored by
Senator Madaleno
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 421
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Comptroller to implement electronic filing of alcoholic beverage tax returns on or before January 1, 2018.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0648
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {459630/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Hearing 4/09 at 9:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
72
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
72
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted (138-0)
Proceedings
72
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
72
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 421
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 3:00 p.m.
Senate 4/04/2016 4/05/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable with Amendments {459630/1 Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/05/2016 3/30/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 60
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 63
House 4/08/2016 4/08/2016 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 4/08/2016 4/08/2016 Hearing 4/09 at 9:30 a.m.
House 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/12/2016 4/09/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 72
House 4/12/2016 4/09/2016 Second Reading Passed 72
House 4/12/2016 4/09/2016 Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted (138-0) 72
House 4/12/2016 4/09/2016 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 72
Senate 4/12/2016 4/08/2016 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 421
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM