Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Regulation - Micro Markets - Licensure
Sponsored by
Senator Reilly
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 339
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that the owner or operator of a micro market is not required to have a person in charge present during the hours of operation under certain circumstances; establishing the requirements for certain food sold at a micro market; requiring the owner or operator of a micro market to post a certain sign that is clearly visible to the consumer; requiring certain video surveillance recordings to be maintained for 14 days and to be made available for inspection by the Comptroller or certain other agencies within 24 hours of a certain request; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1087
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Business Regulation - Micro Markets - Licensure
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {797679/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Business Regulation - Micro Markets - Licensure
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 339
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Business Regulation - Micro Markets - Licensure
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Business Regulation - Micro Markets - Licensure
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {797679/1 Adopted 45
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Business Regulation - Micro Markets - Licensure
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 47
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Referred Economic Matters 46
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 63
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 339
Text - Chapter - Business Regulation - Micro Markets - Licensure
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 17-1701 through 17-1706 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM