Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax - Credit for Accessibility Design Features - Newly Constructed Apartment Buildings
Sponsored by
Senator Guzzone
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding a specified property tax credit authorized against the county or municipal corporation property tax for residential real property equipped with a specified accessibility feature to include specified newly constructed apartment buildings; authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City or the governing body of a county or municipal corporation to define, by law, specified accessibility or universal design features that qualify for the credit; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Property Tax - Credit for Accessibility Design Features - Newly Constructed Apartment Buildings
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM