Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health - Prescription Drug Affordability Board
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier and Lam
Status
In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Prescription Drug Affordability Board to protect State residents, State and local governments, commercial health plans, health care providers, pharmacies licensed in the State, and other stakeholders within the health care system from the high costs of prescription drug products; providing for the membership of the Board and the disclosure of certain conflicts of interest; requiring the Board to identify certain prescription drug products with certain costs; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0768
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health - Prescription Drug Affordability Board
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {367572/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Health - Prescription Drug Affordability Board
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
4/06/2019
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Health - Prescription Drug Affordability Board
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable with Amendments {367572/1 Adopted 61
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
Text - Third - Health - Prescription Drug Affordability Board
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62
House 4/06/2019 3/30/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 65
House 4/06/2019 4/06/2019 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-2C-01 through 21-2C-13 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM