Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Disclosure of Contributions by Persons Doing Public Business - Enforcement
Sponsored by
Senator Lam
Status
In the Senate - Senate Requests House Recede
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the manner in which the State Board of Elections is authorized to impose fees for the late filing of certain statements of contributions by persons doing public business; requiring certain persons who violate certain provisions of law requiring disclosure of contributions by persons doing public business to pay a civil penalty in accordance with certain provisions of the Act; prohibiting a certain penalty from exceeding $5,000; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0951
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/29/2020
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/29/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/4 (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/01/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/01/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {393222/1 (Senator Hough)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2020
Legislative Date
3/01/2020
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {393222/1 (Senator Hough) Withdrawn
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {753925/1 (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (31-14)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/17/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {335360/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (114-19)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (98-36)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
52A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Election Law - Disclosure of Contributions by Persons Doing Public Business - Enforcement
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/03/2020 2/29/2020 Favorable 39
Senate 3/03/2020 2/29/2020 Motion Special Order until 3/4 (Senator Hough) Adopted 39
Senate 3/04/2020 3/01/2020 Favorable Adopted 40
Senate 3/04/2020 3/01/2020 Floor Amendment {393222/1 (Senator Hough) 40
Senate 3/04/2020 3/01/2020 Motion Laid Over (Senator Guzzone) Adopted 40
Senate 3/05/2020 3/02/2020 Floor Amendment {393222/1 (Senator Hough) Withdrawn 41
Senate 3/05/2020 3/02/2020 Floor Amendment {753925/1 (Senator Hough) Adopted 41
Senate 3/05/2020 3/02/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
Text - Third - Election Law - Disclosure of Contributions by Persons Doing Public Business - Enforcement
Senate 3/09/2020 3/04/2020 Third Reading Passed (31-14) 43
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Referred Ways and Means 44
House 3/10/2020 3/10/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/17/2020 3/17/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable with Amendments {335360/1 Adopted 50
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (114-19) 50
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (98-36) 50
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments 52A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Senate Requests House Recede 52A
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-104,   14-107,   14-107.1, 14-107.2 )
Last Updated: 3/23/2020 8:47 AM