Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Utilities - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Combustion Source
Sponsored by
Senator Montgomery
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Synopsis
Prohibiting an electricity supplier from receiving renewable energy credits from a combustion source in an amount greater than a specified renewable energy credit amount on and after January 1, 2016; and stating that energy from a combustion source is eligible for inclusion in meeting the renewable energy portfolio standard if it is generated at a system or facility that existed and was operational as of January 1, 2015, even if the facility or system was not capable of generating electricity on that date.
Committees
Original:
Rules
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/16/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/13/2015 2/16/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
(   7-701, 7-703, 7-704 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page