Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - State Board of Pharmacy - Waivers - Pharmacies That Only Dispense Devices
Sponsored by
Senator Montgomery
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the State Board of Pharmacy to waive specified requirements for specified pharmacies that only dispense devices in accordance with specified rules and regulations; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0868
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 42
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Second Reading Passed 42
Senate 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 44
House 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations 46
House 3/20/2013 3/20/2013 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 65
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Second Reading Passed 65
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Returned Passed 67
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM