Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Installation and Use of Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment
Sponsored by
Senators Feldman and Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that specified governing documents of a condominium or homeowners association that prohibit or restrict electric vehicle recharging equipment are void and unenforceable; establishing requirements and procedures relating to an application to the governing body of a condominium or homeowners association to install or use electric vehicle recharging equipment; requiring landlords to approve a tenant's request to install electric vehicle recharging equipment under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/16/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/13/2015 2/16/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/26/2015 2/27/2015 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-111.4, 11B-111.7, 8-119, 8-120 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM