Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property and Casualty Insurance - Vessel Liability Coverage - Required
Sponsored by
Senators Ramirez and Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing vessel liability insurance in the State; providing for the types of basic and additional coverage under a policy of vessel liability insurance; requiring specified minimum security for specified vessels that are principally operated in the waters of the State; providing for the required form and benefits under the security; authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to accept specified forms of security; providing that a violation of specified provisions of the Act is a misdemeanor; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0954
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Senate 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-1001 through 19-1018, 27-609.1 )
(   8-701, 8-739, 8-745 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM