Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Talbot County - Child Support Enforcement - Transfer of Personnel
Sponsored by
Senator Colburn
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 552
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Transferring specified employees of Talbot County who served as employees of the child support division of the Talbot County State's Attorney's Office as of September 30, 2013, to the Department of Human Resources on a specified date; requiring that specified position identification numbers be created in a specified manner; requiring that each transferred employee be given specified credit for specified purposes and retain specified annual and sick leave credit and service credit in the Employees' Pension System; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0805
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
2/28/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {827679/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
2/28/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 552
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/26/2014 2/27/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/28/2014 2/28/2014 Favorable with Amendments {827679/1 Report Adopted 36
Senate 2/28/2014 2/28/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36
Senate 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 37
House 3/04/2014 3/04/2014 First Reading Appropriations 40
House 3/10/2014 3/10/2014 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2014 4/03/2014 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 63
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Second Reading Passed 63
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 64
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 552
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM