Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Physicians - Genetic Counselors - Licensing
Sponsored by
Senator Lam
Status
In the House - First Reading Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Physicians to license genetic counselors; providing that provisions of the Act do not limit the right of certain individuals to practice certain occupations; establishing the Genetic Counseling Advisory Committee within the Board; requiring individuals, on or after October 1, 2022, to be licensed by the Board as genetic counselors before practicing genetic counseling in the State except under certain circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1040
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Board of Physicians - Genetic Counselors - Licensing
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {534732/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Board of Physicians - Genetic Counselors - Licensing
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
47B
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - State Board of Physicians - Genetic Counselors - Licensing
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable with Amendments {534732/1 Adopted 45
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - State Board of Physicians - Genetic Counselors - Licensing
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 47
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Health and Government Operations 47B
File Code
Subjects
Age
Statutes
(   14-5G-01 through 14-5G-27, 14-5G-27 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2020 10:17 AM