Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workgroup on Adaptive Reuse of Vacant Commercial Spaces
Sponsored by
Senator Washington (Chair, Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:15 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Workgroup on Adaptive Reuse of Vacant Commercial Spaces to study the potential for conversion of vacant or underutilized commercial spaces into residential, mix-use, and commercial spaces in order to increase the affordable housing stock in the State; requiring the Workgroup to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before November 30, 2021; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0877
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Workgroup on Adaptive Reuse of Vacant Commercial Spaces
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Workgroup on Adaptive Reuse of Vacant Commercial Spaces
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Hearing 2/23 at 1:15 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/25/2021 3:18 PM
Click to return on the top page