Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - License Applications - Durational Residency Requirements
Sponsored by
Senator Miller
Status
In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing certain requirements that a person be a resident for a certain period of time to be issued certain statewide alcoholic beverages licenses and permits; requiring certain partners to remain residents for the duration of time that a certain license is in effect; repealing from certain local alcoholic beverages licenses certain durational residency requirements; declaring the intent of the General Assembly; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0902
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {674538/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
47BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Alcoholic Beverages - License Applications - Durational Residency Requirements
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable with Amendments {674538/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Alcoholic Beverages - License Applications - Durational Residency Requirements
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Economic Matters 47BClick to view Recorded Media
(   12-102, 12-1405, 13-102, 13-1403, 14-102, 14-1704, 19-102, 19-1402, 20-102, 20-1404, 21-102, 21-1401, 21-1405.1, 2-125, 22-102, 2-211, 22-1402, 23-102, 23-1404, 23-1406, 25-1011.1, 25-102, 25-1405, 25-1406, 26-102, 26-1405, 26-1406, 26-1704, 26-1808, 26-2102, 27-102, 27-1402, 27-1403, 28-102, 28-1409, 3-102, 3-104, 3-105, 3-106, 31-102, 31-1312, 31-1402, 32-102, 32-1403, 32-1405, 32-1502, 32-1503, 4-103, 4-104, 4-105, 4-109 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:20 PM
Click to return on the top page