Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services - Operators' Licenses and Vehicle Permits
Sponsored by
Senator Ferguson
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that a passenger motor vehicle used to provide transportation network services have a specified safety inspection certificate issued within 90 days after the first use of the vehicle to provide the services; prohibiting the Public Service Commission from denying an application for specified transportation network operators' licenses due to a criminal conviction or traffic violation that occurred more than 7 years before the application, with an exception; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1552
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services - Operators' Licenses and Vehicle Permits
Senate 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-404, 9-209 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM