Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses, Permits, and Other Authorizations
Sponsored by
Senator Edwards
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners in Garrett County to grant specified license holders a privilege at no charge to sell specified alcoholic beverages at catered events in commemorative or special event bottles under specified circumstances; establishing a Class BDR beer and wine license for a deluxe restaurant; establishing a refillable container permit for specified draft beer license holders; authorizing the Board to issue annually not more than two beer festival licenses; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0749
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {244036/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {903393/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/04/2013 3/04/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments {244036/1 Report Adopted 38
Senate 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38
Senate 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 40
House 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 First Reading Economic Matters 43
House 4/02/2013 4/03/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable with Amendments {903393/1 Report Adopted 61
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0) 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Senate Concur - House Amendment 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Passed Enrolled 67
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-107, 5-201, 5-401, 6-201, 6-401, 7-101, 8-212, 8-308.3, 8-807 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM