Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Service Contracts - Notice and Reporting Requirements
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, Currie, Manno, and Peters
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring specified reporting agencies each year to submit specified reports to the budget committees of the General Assembly; requiring the Board of Public Works to submit a proposed service contract to specified persons and post notice of the Board's intent to enter into a specified service contract on a specified Web site at least 45 days before entering into a specified service contract; authorizing specified budget committees to submit comments to the Board within 30 days after receiving the proposal; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1008
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/27/2014 2/27/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/28/2014 3/03/2014 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM