Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Justice Reinvestment Oversight Board
Sponsored by
Senators Peters, Hough, McFadden, and Zirkin
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Justice Reinvestment Oversight Board; providing for the membership, duties, staffing, procedures, and reporting of the Justice Reinvestment Oversight Board; establishing the Performance Incentive Grant Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; specifying the purpose of the Fund; establishing the Local Government Justice Reinvestment Commission; providing for the membership, duties, staffing, procedures, and reporting of the Local Government Justice Reinvestment Commission; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation and Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 10:30 a.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation and Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 2/15/2016 2/15/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/15/2016 2/15/2016 Hearing 3/14 at 10:30 a.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/09/2016 Text - First - Justice Reinvestment Oversight Board
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-3201 through 9-3212 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM