Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts - Discovery - In-Custody Witness Testimony
Sponsored by
Senator Smith
Status
In the Senate - Referred to interim study by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a State's Attorney to record certain information if a State's Attorney obtains certain testimony or information from an in-custody witness and to report certain information to the Criminal Justice Information System's Central Repository; requiring a State's Attorney to comply with certain discovery requirements; requiring a court to hold a certain hearing to determine whether testimony of an in-custody witness is admissible at trial; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1361
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Courts - Discovery - In-Custody Witness Testimony
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
4/05/2019
Action
Referred to interim study by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m.
Text - First - Courts - Discovery - In-Custody Witness Testimony
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Referred to interim study by Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM