Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance - Motor Vehicle Rental Companies - Limited Lines License to Sell Insurance
Sponsored by
Senator Astle
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 51
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Applying specified provisions of law relating to employees of a motor vehicle rental company that holds a specified limited lines license to authorized representatives of the motor vehicle rental company; requiring a motor vehicle rental company that holds a specified limited lines license to maintain a specified register and to make the register available for inspection by the Maryland Insurance Commissioner as the Commissioner requires; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0732
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2015
Legislative Date
2/16/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {667575/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2015
Legislative Date
4/14/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 51
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/16/2015 2/16/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/26/2015 2/27/2015 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/27/2015 2/27/2015 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/17/2015 3/18/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Favorable with Amendments {667575/1 Report Adopted 45
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 47
House 3/20/2015 3/18/2015 First Reading Economic Matters 48
House 4/01/2015 4/01/2015 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 58
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/02/2015 3/29/2015 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 59
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 4/14/2015 4/14/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 51
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-130, 10-601, 10-602, 10-604, 10-606, 10-607 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM