Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency - Gaming Study - Use of Gaming Proceeds
Sponsored by
Senator Patterson
Status
In the House - First Reading Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency to conduct a certain study on the use of proceeds from certain gambling activities; requiring the Agency to report its findings to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2020; providing for the termination of the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
51
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency - Gaming Study - Use of Gaming Proceeds
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 3/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Adopted 50
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Second Reading Passed 50
Text - Third - State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency - Gaming Study - Use of Gaming Proceeds
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Referred Ways and Means 51
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/1/2020 10:21 AM