Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Campaign Finance - Corporate Contributions and Independent Expenditures - Determination of Stockholder Preference
Sponsored by
Senators Raskin, Madaleno, and Montgomery
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a Maryland corporation or a foreign corporation doing business in the State from making a contribution to a campaign finance entity or an independent expenditure unless a specified condition is met; authorizing a stockholder alleging a violation of specified provisions of the Act to bring an action directly against the directors of the corporation; prohibiting a campaign finance entity from receiving a contribution made in violation of a specified provision of the Act; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-238, 13-245.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM