Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Automated Motor Vehicles - Titling, Registration, and Rules of the Road
Sponsored by
Senator Ferguson
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting an individual from operating an automated motor vehicle in automated mode on a highway; establishing an exception to the prohibition by authorizing specified individuals to operate an automated motor vehicle in automated mode on a highway for research or testing purposes under specified circumstances; requiring an automated motor vehicle that is operated on a highway for research and testing purposes to have a specified individual present in the vehicle and to be properly titled and registered; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/08/2014 3/10/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-103.3, 11-135, 13-101.1, 13-402, 13-939.3, 21-1130 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM