Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class MD Beer, Wine, and Liquor License
Sponsored by
Senator Lam
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a Class MD beer, wine, and liquor license in Baltimore County; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore County to issue the license for use by an establishment that is located in an arts and entertainment district and averages a certain percentage of its daily receipts from food sales; authorizing the license holder to sell beer, wine, and liquor manufactured in the State, at retail, for on-premises consumption; exempting the license from certain license quota limitations; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class MD Beer, Wine, and Liquor License
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   13-102, 13-905 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:20 PM
Click to return on the top page