Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Workgroup on Public Works Contractor Occupational Safety and Health Prequalification Requirements
Sponsored by
Senators Montgomery, Benson, Currie, Feldman, Forehand, Jones-Rodwell, Madaleno, Manno, Peters, Ramirez, Raskin, Stone, and Young
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Labor, Licensing and Regulation to convene a specified workgroup to study and make recommendations regarding public works contractor occupational safety and health prequalification requirements; requiring that the workgroup include representatives of specified organizations; requiring the Department to report its findings and recommendations to the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2014; providing for the termination of the Act at the end of June 30, 2015.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0951
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1486 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
4/05/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {527575/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
67
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/04/2014 4/05/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Favorable with Amendments {527575/1 Report Adopted 61
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 62
House 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 67
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM