Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Hospitals - Community Benefits
Sponsored by
Senator Kelley
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Health Services Cost Review Commission to establish a Community Benefit Reporting Workgroup; requiring the Commission to adopt certain regulations relating to the community health needs of nonprofit hospitals and reporting by nonprofit hospitals regarding community health needs and benefits provided by the hospital; requiring the Commission, on or before October 1, 2020, to issue a certain report, take certain other actions, and submit a copy of a certain report to certain committees of the General Assembly; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1169
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Hospitals - Community Benefits
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Hospitals - Community Benefits
Senate 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/7/2020 1:53 PM