Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Model Performance Evaluation Criteria - Implementation
Sponsored by
Senators King, Madaleno, Manno, Pinsky, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the State Board of Education from requiring a specified model performance evaluation criteria to take effect unless specified conditions are met.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2013
Legislative Date
2/14/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/14/2013 2/14/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-202 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM