Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Funeral Establishments and Crematories - Pre-Need Contracts and Unclaimed Cremains - Reporting and Audit Requirements
Sponsored by
Senators Montgomery, Benson, Feldman, Jones-Rodwell, and Madaleno
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing specified buyers and beneficiaries of pre-need contracts to request that the Maryland State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors conduct specified audits; requiring the Board to require specified funeral establishments or holders of permits for the business of operating a crematory to submit specified reports; requiring specified holders of permits to engage in the operation of a crematory to submit specified reports on unclaimed cremains to the Office of Cemetery Oversight on or after a specified date; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1239
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Senate 2/06/2014 2/06/2014 Hearing cancelled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Senate 2/06/2014 2/06/2014 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Senate 3/11/2014 3/12/2014 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-101, 5-803 )
(   7-101, 7-205, 7-405, 7-406 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM