Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Driver's Education - Income Tax Credit - Assessment of Fees for Driving Offenses
Sponsored by
Senators Montgomery and Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing an individual to claim a specified credit against the State income tax for specified driver education costs paid for a child, stepchild, or legal ward who is eligible to receive free meals at school; requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to assess specified fees on specified licensees convicted of specified driving offenses; establishing the Driver's Education Fund to pay for the tax credit under the Act; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1286
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1336 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation and Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation and Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-736 )
(   12-120, 16-1001 through 16-1003 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM