Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prevailing Wage - Payment for Apprenticeship Programs
Sponsored by
Senator McFadden
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring contractors and subcontractors under public work contracts subject to the prevailing wage rate law to pay the full cost of specified apprenticeship programs unless the contractor or subcontractor participates in an apprenticeship training program for each classification of workers listed in the prevailing wage determination applicable to the public work contract; requiring specified contractors to keep a list of each apprentice and the apprenticeship program in which the apprentice takes part; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0370
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/17/2015 2/18/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/26/2015 2/27/2015 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/27/2015 2/27/2015 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/25/2015 3/26/2015 Unfavorable Report by Finance
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   17-205, 17-220, 17-221 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM