Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Exemption From Covered Employment - Messenger Service Business
Sponsored by
Senators Astle and Hershey
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 697
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "messenger service business" for purposes of a specified exemption from covered employment for specified unemployment benefits; specifying that commission includes specified payment arrangements for purposes of the exemption; and applying the Act retroactively.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1334
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {117772/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/9 (Delegate M. Washington) Rejected
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (115-21)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/28/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 697
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/17/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments {117772/1 Report Adopted 47
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 48
House 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Economic Matters 51
House 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 62
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Second Reading Passed 62
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Motion Special Order until 4/9 (Delegate M. Washington) Rejected 65
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Third Reading Passed (115-21) 65
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/28/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 697
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM