Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health - General - Genetically Engineered Food - Labeling Requirements
Sponsored by
Senators Montgomery, Benson, Feldman, Forehand, Madaleno, Manno, Raskin, and Simonaire
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring specified raw foods and packaged foods that are entirely or partially produced with genetic engineering to display a specified label beginning on July 1, 2015; requiring a manufacturer to include a specified label on specified foods; requiring a supplier to include a specified label on a container used for packaging, holding, or transporting specified foods; requiring a retailer to place a specified label on a shelf or bin containing specified foods; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1191
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 22
Senate 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-1001 through 21-1006 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM