Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Due Process Hearings for Children With Disabilities - Burden of Proof
Sponsored by
Senators Montgomery, Benson, Kittleman, Klausmeier, Pugh, Ramirez, Raskin, and Shank
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring specified public agencies to bear a specified burden of proof in due process hearings that are held to resolve a dispute relating to the provision of a free appropriate public education to children with disabilities; and establishing that a specified provision of law is not intended to change specified record keeping requirements or what constitutes a free and appropriate public education under federal law.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1198
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-413 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM