Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Limited Lines Insurance Licenses - Self-Service Storage Agents
Sponsored by
Senator Peters
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to issue a limited lines license as a self-service storage agent to an owner or operator of a self-service storage facility who meets specified requirements; providing for the scope of the license; providing that an owner or operator is not required to be licensed under specified circumstances; requiring an applicant for a license to file a specified application with the Commissioner; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/19/2013 3/20/2013 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-801 through 10-810 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM