Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pharmacists - Biosimilar Biological Products - Substitutions
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing pharmacists to substitute biosimilar biological products for prescribed biological reference products only under specified circumstances; requiring pharmacists or their designees to give specified notices and record specified information if the pharmacist substitutes an interchangeable biosimilar biological product for a prescribed biological reference product; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {124936/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-1)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Favorable with Amendments {124936/1 Report Adopted 42
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42
Senate 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-1) 44
House 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations 46
House 3/20/2013 3/20/2013 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-101, 12-504, 12-504.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM