Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services - Inmate Telephone Services - Contracts
Sponsored by
Senator Pugh
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to award inmate telephone services contracts to the bidder who submits the bid with the lowest cost to the telephone user; prohibiting the Department from accepting or receiving telephone commissions in excess of the Department's reasonable operating cost for establishing and administering telephone system services to inmates; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0952
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM