Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Foreclosure Sales of Residential Property - Motion for Deficiency Judgment
Sponsored by
Senator Brochin
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the time period, from 3 years to 2 years, within which a specified motion for a deficiency judgment must be filed after the final ratification of the auditor's report following a specified foreclosure sale; applying Section 1 of the Act prospectively to any motion for a deficiency judgment filed on or after July 1, 2015, on a deed of trust, mortgage, or promissory note that secures or is secured by residential property that was owner-occupied at the time the order to docket or complaint to foreclose was filed; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/17/2015 2/18/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/26/2015 2/27/2015 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-105.13 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM