Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Education Council - Adult Correctional Institutions - Study of Access to the Internet and Higher Education Courses (Raising Education Attainment)
Sponsored by
Senator Rosapepe
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Correctional Education Council, in cooperation with the Maryland Higher Education Commission and the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services, to convene a stakeholder workgroup to identify issues related to internet access and the availability and demand for higher education courses in correctional institutions; and requiring the workgroup's findings and recommendations be reported to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2016.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {724636/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/19/2016 3/21/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments {724636/1 Report Adopted 47A
Senate 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 48A
House 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 First Reading Appropriations 52
House 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/01/2016 4/01/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 4/01/2016 4/01/2016 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM