Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Personal Injury Protection - Rejection of Coverage
Sponsored by
Senators Middleton, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, Kelley, Klausmeier, Mathias, Pugh, and Reilly
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that, under specified circumstances, a first named insured under a specified policy of motor vehicle liability insurance is not required to obtain coverage for specified medical, hospital, and disability benefits that must be provided by specified insurers; requiring the Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund to offer a specified first named insured, at the time of application for a specified policy, the option to reject coverage for specified benefits under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0900
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {677771/1
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Laid Over (Senator Ramirez) Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {677771/1
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Special Order until 3/29 (Senator Ramirez) Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {677771/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-2)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/24/2016 3/25/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/25/2016 3/23/2016 Favorable with Amendments {677771/1 52
Senate 3/25/2016 3/23/2016 Laid Over (Senator Ramirez) Adopted 52
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable with Amendments {677771/1 53
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Special Order until 3/29 (Senator Ramirez) Adopted 53
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Favorable with Amendments {677771/1 Report Adopted 54
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 55
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 58
House 4/04/2016 4/04/2016 Rereferred to Economic Matters
House 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 62
House 4/06/2016 3/30/2016 Second Reading Passed 62
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Third Reading Passed (134-2) 65
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-505, 19-506, 19-506.1 )
(   17-103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM