Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electricity - Community Renewable Energy Generating System - Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Senators Ramirez, Raskin, Benson, Ferguson, Jones-Rodwell, Madaleno, Middleton, Montgomery, Pinsky, Rosapepe, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a pilot program on community renewable energy generating systems under the authority of the Public Service Commission; stating when the pilot program will begin and terminate; providing for the structure and operation of the pilot program, including the generation of electricity and allocation of costs and credits to system subscribers; authorizing an electric company to submit a petition to own and operate a community renewable energy generating system to the Commission; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1192
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM