Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Baltimore City - Control of the Police Department of Baltimore City
Sponsored by
Senator McCray (By Request - Baltimore City Administration)
Status
In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Racial and Equity Impact note – 2021 Maryland Police Reform Proposals
Synopsis
Providing that the Police Department of Baltimore City is an agency and instrumentality of the City of Baltimore, instead of the State; providing that certain police officers have the authority conferred under a certain provision of law; establishing an Advisory Board on the Transfer of Control of the Police Department of Baltimore City; providing for the membership, chair, staffing, and duties of the Advisory Board; requiring the Advisory Board to submit certain reports at certain times; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1027
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 4 of the bill
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore City – Control of the Police Department of Baltimore City
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {948077/1 Adopted
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Hearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Baltimore City – Control of the Police Department of Baltimore City
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/03/2021 3/03/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/03/2021 2/18/2021 Favorable with Amendments {948077/1 Adopted 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/03/2021 2/18/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Baltimore City - Control of the Police Department of Baltimore City
Senate 3/03/2021 2/18/2021 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Smith) Adopted 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/03/2021 2/18/2021 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 19 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2021 2/28/2021 Referred Judiciary 19 Click to view Recorded Media
(   16-2, 16-3 )
Last Updated: 3/4/2021 10:04 AM
Click to return on the top page