Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development - Green Business Incentive Zones
Sponsored by
Senators Ramirez, Colburn, Ferguson, Montgomery, Rosapepe, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the creation of green business incentive zones in the State; establishing eligibility criteria and factors to be considered by the Secretary of Business and Economic Development in designating the zones; establishing procedures for applying for establishment of the zones and the benefits available in the zones; establishing a State income tax credit and real property tax credit available to specified businesses located in a green business incentive zone; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0473
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation and Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation and Finance
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-102, 5-105, 5-1401 through 5-1408 )
(   10-702.1 )
(   9-103.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM