Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Information Act - Revisions
Sponsored by
Senators Kagan, Bates, Feldman, Guzzone, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Madaleno, Ready, Smith, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that, except as otherwise provided by law, the Public Information Act does not authorize a custodian of records to allow the inspection of the Social Security number or date of birth of an individual except to a person in interest; requiring, except under certain circumstances, a custodian to deny inspection of a certain part of a personal surveillance video; requiring that a victim who is the subject of a record that is denied inspection be notified of all requests to inspect the record; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1638
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Information Act - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {424933/1
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {424933/1
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {424933/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {873425/2 (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {873425/3 (Senator Hough) Adopted (37-6)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Information Act - Revisions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/20 (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
48C
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/18/2018
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Information Act - Revisions
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable with Amendments {424933/1 47
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Motion Laid Over (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 47
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments {424933/1 48
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Smith) Adopted 48
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments {424933/1 Adopted 48A
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Floor Amendment {873425/2 (Senator Hough) Adopted 48A
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Floor Amendment {873425/3 (Senator Hough) Adopted (37-6) 48A
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48A
Text - Third - Public Information Act - Revisions
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Motion Special Order until 3/20 (Senator Smith) Adopted 48C
Senate 3/20/2018 3/18/2018 Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Conway) Adopted 49
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-101, 4-103, 4-327.1, 4-341 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM