Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Advance Directive Registry - Fee and Date of Operation
Sponsored by
Senator Manno
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 549
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene to set a fee, by regulation, for specified services of the Advance Directive Registry; and requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to take the steps necessary to make the Registry operational on or before October 1, 2014.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0915
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (41-6)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
55A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 549
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/06/2013 3/07/2013 Unfavorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/21/2013 3/22/2013 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 51
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 Second Reading Passed 51
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (41-6) 52
House 3/26/2013 3/22/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations 55A
House 3/27/2013 3/27/2013 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/06/2013 4/08/2013 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 66
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Second Reading Passed 66
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Returned Passed 67
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 549
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-620, 5-622 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM